Reports for Moosfrei GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Moosfrei GmbH
- Moosfrei GmbH has its legal headquarters in Menzingen and is active. It operates in the sector «Cleaning of buildings».
- The management of the company Moosfrei GmbH consists of 3 persons.
- On the 31.10.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZG is CHE-156.881.365.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.06.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Menzingen
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.4.016.608-0
UID/VAT
CHE-156.881.365
Sector
Cleaning of buildings
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Reinigung und Unterhalt von Gebäuden und anderer Infrastruktur sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Moosfrei GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005593901, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Moosfrei GmbH, in Menzingen, CHE-156.881.365, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 13.04.2022, Publ. 1005449992).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Moser, Kilian, von Hochdorf, in Hochdorf, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imboden, Fabian, von Stans, in Sarnen, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 270 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Amstad, Thomas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stans, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 270 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005449992, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Moosfrei GmbH, in Menzingen, CHE-156.881.365, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2019, Publ. 1004663603).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imboden, Fabian, von Stans, in Sarnen, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Amstad, Thomas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stans, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Grote, Thomas, in Rekingen (AG), Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR01-1004663603, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Moosfrei GmbH, in Menzingen, CHE-156.881.365, Sonnenberg 42, 6313 Menzingen, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
19.06.2019.
Zweck:
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Reinigung und Unterhalt von Gebäuden und anderer Infrastruktur sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Stammkapital:
CHF 60'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Mit Erklärung vom 19.06.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Imboden, Fabian, von Stans, in Sarnen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Grote, Thomas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rekingen (AG), Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 210 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Moser, Kilian, von Hochdorf, in Hochdorf, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Mühlemann, Richard, von Bönigen, in Risch, Gesellschafter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 60 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.