Reports for Montres Journe Genève SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Montres Journe Genève SA
- Montres Journe Genève SA has its legal headquarters in Genève, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 18.09.1996.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 21.08.2017.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.478.185.
- Companies with the same address as Montres Journe Genève SA: Méca Journe Sàrl, Montres Journe SA, PLOFLO SA.
Management (3)
newest board members
Philippe Rabin,
Louis François Marien Pouyat,
François-Paul Journe
newest authorized signatories
Philippe Rabin,
Louis François Marien Pouyat,
François-Paul Journe
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.09.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.1.457.996-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.478.185
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Développement, fabrication et commercialisation d'articles relevant de l'horlogerie et de la joaillerie; développement, acquisition, exploitation ou cession de procédés et brevets, ainsi qu'octroi de licences de fabrication, de commercialisation et de distribution relatives aux domaines d'activités précitées; participation dans toutes opérations ou entreprises commerciales ou industrielles pouvant se rattacher à l'objet social.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDUCIAIRE CHAVAZ SA | Carouge (GE) | 05.10.2009 | 20.09.2010 | |
AUDIT & CO SA, en liquidation | Genève | 08.01.2007 | 04.10.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- TIM Horlogerie SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Montres Journe Genève SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3706161, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Montres Journe Genève SA, à Genève, CHE-108.478.185 (FOSC du 21.06.2017, p. 0/3594197). Conversion des 100 actions de CHF 1'000, jusqu'ici au porteur, en actions nominatives, liées selon statuts.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives, liées selon statuts.
Communication aux actionnaires:
lettre recommandée ou citation remise contre récépissé. Nouveaux statuts du 10.08.2017.
Publication number: 3594197, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Montres Journe Genève SA, à Genève, CHE-108.478.185 (FOSC du 29.06.2016, p. 0/2920957). Perret Nicolas n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Rabin Philippe, de France, à Eysins, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 2920957, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Montres Journe Genève SA, à Genève, CHE-108.478.185 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225832). Perret Jean (décédé) n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. L'administrateur Perret Nicolas signe désormais collectivement à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.