Branches (1)
Reports for Montaldo AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Montaldo AG
- Montaldo AG from Biel/Bienne operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 29.03.1971.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 04.03.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-107.847.498.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.1971
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.009.679-7
UID/VAT
CHE-107.847.498
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung und das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in der Unternehmensberatung, das Erwerben, Halten und Verwalten von Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen Finanzierungs-, Anlage- und Darlehensgeschäfte jeglicher Art tätigen, Bürgschaften eingehen und Sicherheiten zugunsten Dritter leisten sowie überhaupt alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die der Förderung des Gesellschaftszweckes dienen und damit direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
renius revisions ag | Bassersdorf | 03.08.2018 | 19.02.2024 | |
Rovisa Wirtschaftsprüfungs AG | Dietikon | 07.11.2014 | 02.08.2018 | |
ITS Treuhand AG | Bassersdorf | 18.10.2012 | 06.11.2014 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Montaldo AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005976021, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Montaldo AG, bisher in Spreitenbach, CHE-107.847.498, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2024, Publ. 1005966001).
Statutenänderung:
23.02.2024.
Sitz neu:
Biel/Bienne.
Domizil neu:
Freiburgstrasse 42, 2503 Biel/Bienne.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bigler, Christian, von Worb, in Bern, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005976533, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Montaldo AG, in Spreitenbach, CHE-107.847.498, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2024, Publ. 1005966001). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Biel/Bienne im Handelsregister des Kantons Bern eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Aargau von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005966001, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Montaldo AG, in Spreitenbach, CHE-107.847.498, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2023, Publ. 1005918908). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 30.01.2024 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
renius revisions ag (CHE-435.620.062), in Bassersdorf, Revisionsstelle.
Zweigniederlassung neu:
[gestrichen: Brügg (CHE-201.655.179) (HR BE)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.