Address
c/o CORE Service SA
Rue Pedro-Meylan 1
1208 Genève
Reports for Montafa SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Montafa SA
- Montafa SA with its legal headquarters in Genève is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Montafa SA is active.
- Montafa SA was founded on 11.12.1985.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 10.07.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GE under the UID CHE-100.766.083.
- Next to the company Montafa SA there are 65 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ad-awards.com sàrl, Alma Family Office Sàrl, AMAS PRIVATE TRUST COMPANY SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Genève
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.001.068-4
UID/VAT
CHE-100.766.083
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Participation à des sociétés financières, commerciales et industrielles; achat, vente, gestion et administration papiers valeurs, métaux précieux, biens mobiliers et immobiliers à l'étranger.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
JONES CONCEPT & CONSULTING SA en liquidation | Fribourg | 19.04.2011 | 15.08.2017 | |
H. Blaser SA en liquidation | Sion | 12.01.2010 | 18.04.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Montafa SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005791794, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Montafa SA, à Genève, CHE-100.766.083 (FOSC du 16.02.2018, p. 0/4061761). Howald Mathieu n'est plus administrateur;
ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Piras Cardona Patrick, d'Espagne, à Corsier (GE), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue Pedro-MEYLAN 1, c/o CORE Service SA, 1208 Genève.
Publication number: 4061761, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Montafa SA, à Genève, CHE-100.766.083 (FOSC du 16.08.2017, p. 0/3700203). Conversion des 200 actions de CHF 1'000, jusqu'ici au porteur, en actions nominatives.
Capital-actions:
CHF 200'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 200 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives. Statuts modifiés le 07.02.2018, ainsi que sur des points non soumis à publication. Canton Antonio n'est plus administrateur et ses pouvoirs sont radiés. Howald Mathieu, Chêne-Bourg, à Genève, administrateur unique avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 3700203, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Montafa SA, à Genève, CHE-100.766.083 (FOSC du 19.02.2016, p. 0/2678813). Selon déclaration du 19.07.2017, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint. AUDEXA SA n'est plus organe de révision.