Reports for Mona Hanna
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mona Hanna
- Mona Hanna has its legal headquarters in Thônex and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities».
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 27.06.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register GE under the UID CHE-108.457.958.
Management (6)
newest members of the committee
Nicolas Berner,
Tiziana Schaller,
Philippe Decrey,
Philippe François Schaller,
Clément Schaller
newest authorized signatories
Nicolas Berner,
Tiziana Schaller,
Philippe Decrey,
Philippe François Schaller,
Clément Schaller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.11.1995
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Thônex
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.1.506.995-9
UID/VAT
CHE-108.457.958
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Contribuer au bien-être des personnes âgées ou autre personne ayant besoin d'assistance, notamment par la gestion d'un établissement médico-social sous le nom de "Villa Mona Hanna"; également la gestion et exploitation de tut autre immeuble et/ou institution, ainsi que l'octroi de prestations d'aide et soins à domicile, y compris la livraison de repas et transport des personnes, à tout bénéficiaire afin de préserver son autonomie; elle n'a pas de but lucratif. (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PUBLEX Fiduciaire SARL | Genève | 27.06.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Comtesas + Gerficom SA | Genève | 05.10.2018 | 26.06.2023 | |
Berney Associés Audit SA | Genève | 07.03.2017 | 04.10.2018 | |
ECHO SA | Genève | 18.06.2012 | 06.03.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mona Hanna
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005779749, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Mona Hanna, à Thônex, CHE-108.457.958, association (FOSC du 10.03.2021, p. 0/1005120805). Berner Nicolas, de Unterkulm, à Troinex, est membre du comité avec signature collective à deux. Comtesas + Gerficom SA (CHE-102.574.732) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
PUBLEX Fiduciaire SARL (CHE-104.303.262), à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005120805, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Mona Hanna, à Thônex, CHE-108.457.958 (FOSC du 05.03.2019, p. 0/1004580879). Les membres du comité Schaller Tiziana, jusqu'ici présidente, nommée secrétaire, et Schaller Philippe, jusqu'ici secrétaire, continuent à signer collectivement à deux. Decrey Philippe, de Genève, à Thônex, est membre et président du comité avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004580879, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Mona Hanna, à Chêne-Bougeries, CHE-108.457.958 (FOSC du 05.10.2018, p. 0/1004470944).
Nouveau siège:
Thônex, Chemin Etienne-Chennaz 14, 1226 Thônex.
Nouveau but:
contribuer au bien-être des personnes âgées ou autre personne ayant besoin d'assistance, notamment par la gestion d'un établissement médico-social sous le nom de "Villa Mona Hanna";
également la gestion et exploitation de tut autre immeuble et/ou institution, ainsi que l'octroi de prestations d'aide et soins à domicile, y compris la livraison de repas et transport des personnes, à tout bénéficiaire afin de préserver son autonomie;
elle n'a pas de but lucratif. (cf. statuts pour but complet). Nouveaux statuts du 20.12.2018.
Nouveau membre du comité:
Schaller Clément, de Val Terbi, à Saint-Sulpice (VD), avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.