Reports for Miramaris AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Miramaris AG
- Miramaris AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of other financial institutions». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The company was founded on 11.09.2014 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 26.08.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-260.957.109.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.09.2014
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.798.767-8
UID/VAT
CHE-260.957.109
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beteiligung an Unternehmen im In- und Ausland; Erbringung von Dienstleistungen jeglicher Art, insbesondere auch im Zusammenhang mit dem Handel und Vertrieb von Produkten, von Beratungs- und Vermittlungsdienstleistungen sowie von der Einführung, Positionierung und Repräsentierung von natürlichen und juristischen Personen und deren Immaterialgüterrechte wie Lizenzen, Patente und Marken in lokalen Märkten; Erwerb, Verwaltung und/oder Veräusserung von Beteiligungen und Immaterialgüterrechten aller Art; Tätigung von Immobiliengeschäften aller Art; Finanzierung, Verwaltung, Vermietung und Veräusserung von Grundbesitz im In- und Ausland.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Miramaris AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005278025, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Miramaris AG, in Luzern, CHE-260.957.109, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 16.09.2019, Publ. 1004716523).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pasquier , Jocelyn, von Le Pâquier (FR), in Bursinel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Morges].
Publication number: HR02-1004716523, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Miramaris AG, in Luzern, CHE-260.957.109, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 178 vom 16.09.2014, S.0, Publ. 1716123).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Winkler, Simon, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pasquier , Jocelyn, von Le Pâquier (FR), in Morges, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1716123, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Miramaris AG, in Luzern, CHE-260.957.109, Rebstockhalde 31, 6006 Luzern, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
05.09.2014.
Zweck:
Beteiligung an Unternehmen im In- und Ausland;
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen jeglicher Art, insbesondere auch im Zusammenhang mit dem Handel und Vertrieb von Produkten, von Beratungs- und Vermittlungsdienstleistungen sowie von der Einführung, Positionierung und Repräsentierung von natürlichen und juristischen Personen und deren Immaterialgüterrechte wie Lizenzen, Patente und Marken in lokalen Märkten;
Erwerb, Verwaltung und/oder Veräusserung von Beteiligungen und Immaterialgüterrechten aller Art;
Tätigung von Immobiliengeschäften aller Art;
Finanzierung, Verwaltung, Vermietung und Veräusserung von Grundbesitz im In- und Ausland.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief, Telefax oder rückbestätigter E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 05.09.2014 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Winkler, Andreas, von Luzern, in Havanna (CU), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Winkler, Simon, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.