Address
c/o Tanja Badertscher
Kreuzgraben 2
3400 Burgdorf
Reports for Mimag AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Mimag AG
- Mimag AG has its legal headquarters in Burgdorf and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 28.12.1994.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 11.09.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Mimag AG is the following: CHE-102.305.735.
Management (4)
newest board members
Christoph Bürgi,
Verena Michel-Huggenberger,
Sascha Michel,
Tanja Badertscher-Michel
newest authorized signatories
Verena Michel-Huggenberger,
Sascha Michel,
Tanja Badertscher-Michel
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Burgdorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.005.144-3
UID/VAT
CHE-102.305.735
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, Verkauf sowie die Verwaltung von Liegenschaften auf eigene und fremde Rechnung. Sie kann sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen und alles tun, was geeignet ist, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder mit diesem in Zusammenhang steht.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Strasser AG Bern | Bern | 21.11.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | <2004 | 20.11.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Mimag AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005834851, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Mimag AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-102.305.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 10.05.2022, Publ. 1005469622).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgi, Klaus, von Burgdorf und Aarberg, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bürgi, Christoph, von Burgdorf und Aarberg, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005469622, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Mimag AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-102.305.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 255 vom 31.12.2020, Publ. 1005062419).
Domizil neu:
c/o Tanja Badertscher, Kreuzgraben 2, 3400 Burgdorf.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Michel, Sascha, von Köniz, in Scheunen (Jegenstorf), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Michel, Sascha Nicolas, in Burgdorf].
Publication number: HR02-1005062419, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Mimag AG, in Burgdorf, CHE-102.305.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 13.11.2017, Publ. 3864335).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Michel, Peter, von Köniz, in Burgdorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Michel, Sascha Nicolas, von Köniz, in Burgdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Badertscher-Michel, Tanja, von Rapperswil (BE) und Köniz, in Burgdorf, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Bangerten und Köniz, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Michel-Huggenberger, Verena, von Köniz, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bürgi, Klaus, von Burgdorf und Aarberg, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.