Address
c/o RA Markus Schnurrenberger
Alpenstrasse 2
6301 Zug
Reports for MF Beteiligungen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MF Beteiligungen AG
- MF Beteiligungen AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Zug. MF Beteiligungen AG belongs to the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active.
- MF Beteiligungen AG has 5 persons entered in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 19.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company MF Beteiligungen AG is registered under the UID CHE-103.978.440.
- 004 ECOM Holding AG, AutoZebra AG, Avora Vorsorgeberatung AG are registered at the same address.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marcus Pannier,
Jürg Danuser,
Paul Smolinski,
Nadeem Ahmad,
Ursula Elisabeth Bracke
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.12.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.928.043-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.978.440
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann ihrer direkten oder indirekten Muttergesellschaft sowie deren oder ihren direkten oder indirekten Tochtergesellschaften Darlehen oder andere Finanzierungen gewähren und für Verbindlichkeiten von solchen anderen Gesellschaften Sicherheiten aller Art stellen, einschliesslich mittels Pfandrechten an oder fiduziarischen Übereignungen von Aktiven der Gesellschaft oder Garantien jedwelcher Art, ob gegen Entgelt oder nicht.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Steinhausen | 23.03.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
MT TREUHAND AG | Zug | <2004 | 22.03.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- myfactory Global Distributor SA
- Alix Distribution AG
- Alix Distribution
- von Trzebiatowski Peter AG für Werbung
- Immocap AG
- Peter von Trzebiatowski AG für Werbung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MF Beteiligungen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006109191, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
MF Beteiligungen AG, in Zug, CHE-103.978.440, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 14.08.2023, Publ. 1005815728).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Holzmann, Jörg Eugen, von Buchrain, in Mülligen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pannier, Marcus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Stuttgart (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Danuser, Jürg, von Landquart, in Diepoldsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Smolinski, Paul, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Farnham (GB), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005815728, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
MF Beteiligungen AG, in Zug, CHE-103.978.440, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 16.09.2022, Publ. 1005563113).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ahmad, Nadeem, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bad Nauheim (DE), Prokurist, mit Einzelprokura;
Bracke, Ursula, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Essingen (DE), Prokuristin, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: HR02-1005563113, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
MF Beteiligungen AG, in Zug, CHE-103.978.440, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 02.02.2022, Publ. 1005395322).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Giordano, Giovanni, von Wolfhalden, in Bellmund, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holzmann, Jörg Eugen, von Buchrain, in Mülligen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.