Reports for Meyer Gärten AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Meyer Gärten AG
- Meyer Gärten AG is active in the industry «Gardening and landscaping» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Belp.
- The management of the company Meyer Gärten AG consists of 4 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.01.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-109.555.925.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
Barbara Guggisberg,
Gabriel Lukas Nyffenegger,
Lauro Nicolas Spiegel Kunz
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Guggisberg,
Gabriel Lukas Nyffenegger,
Lauro Nicolas Spiegel Kunz,
Stephan Meyer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.04.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Belp
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.030.484-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.555.925
Sector
Gardening and landscaping
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Garten- und Landschaftsbau, die Planung und den Unterhalt von Gärten, den Betrieb einer Baumschule sowie den Handel mit Pflanzen und Gartenartikeln. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 12.01.2024 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bommer + Partner Treuhand KLG | Bern | 18.10.2022 | 11.01.2024 | |
KPB Revision AG | Köniz | 27.10.2014 | 17.10.2022 | |
BKF Controlling + Revision AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 26.10.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Meyer Gärten AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005932657, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Meyer Gärten AG, in Belp, CHE-109.555.925, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 03.04.2023, Publ. 1005715227).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bommer + Partner Treuhandgesellschaft (CHE-106.498.509), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
T + R AG (CHE-105.857.623), in Gümligen (Muri bei Bern), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005715227, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Meyer Gärten AG, in Belp, CHE-109.555.925, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2022, Publ. 1005585276).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Guggisberg, Barbara, von Belp, in Mühlethurnen (Thurnen), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Nyffenegger, Gabriel Lukas, von Eriswil, in Ittigen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Spiegel Kunz, Lauro Nicolas, von Kestenholz, in Belp, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005585276, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Meyer Gärten AG, in Belp, CHE-109.555.925, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 29.06.2021, Publ. 1005231655).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Urs, von Ulmiz, in Bowil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
KPB Revision AG (CHE-210.556.079), in Liebefeld (Köniz), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Stephan, von Ulmiz, in Oberdiessbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bommer + Partner Treuhandgesellschaft (CHE-106.498.509), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.