Reports for Metron Haus AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Metron Haus AG
- Metron Haus AG with its legal headquarters in Brugg AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Metron Haus AG is active.
- The management of the company Metron Haus AG consists of 6 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 24.08.2021.
- Metron Haus AG is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-102.351.221.
- Gemiwo AG, Metron AG, Metron Architektur AG are registered at the same address.
Management (6)
newest board members
Cornelia Adelheid Aloisia Diethelm,
Barbara Gloor,
Rudolf Stauffer,
Ruth Schmitt,
Dr. Marc Dominik Knellwolf
newest authorized signatories
Cornelia Adelheid Aloisia Diethelm,
Barbara Gloor,
Rudolf Stauffer,
Rolf Meyer,
Ruth Schmitt
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.04.1965
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brugg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.001.262-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.351.221
CHE-116.296.640 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Erstellung, Verwaltung und Vermietung von Liegenschaften.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 07.09.2017 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hüsser Gmür + Partner AG | Baden | 19.08.2008 | 06.09.2017 | |
Viktor Meier-Huser, dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer | Zürich | <2004 | 18.08.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Metron Haus AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005276677, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Metron Haus AG, in Brugg, CHE-102.351.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2019, Publ. 1004740780).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lang, Nadja, von Bachs, in Zollikerberg, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Diethelm, Cornelia, von Schübelbach, in Kölliken, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004740780, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Metron Haus AG, in Brugg, CHE-102.351.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2017, Publ. 3739471).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneider Bless, Regula, von Luzern, in Zürich, Delegierte des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gloor, Barbara, von Niederlenz, in Lenzburg, Delegierte des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3739471, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Metron Haus AG, in Brugg, CHE-102.351.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 18.05.2017, Publ. 3530421).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hüsser Gmür + Partner AG Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft (CHE-106.823.621), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stauffer, Rudolf, von Eggiwil, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BDO AG (CHE-345.012.024), in Aarau, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.