Reports for Meritum AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Meritum AG
- Meritum AG is currently active and the industry «Fund management». The legal headquarters are in Wollerau.
- Meritum AG was founded on 06.02.1975.
- On the 25.05.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SZ is CHE-102.679.868.
- On the same address there are 14 other active companies registered. These include: Be Light Medical AG, Burgerstein Apotheke AG, C&C SWISSINVEST AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Daniel Stefan Rüdisüli,
Urs Melchior Aegerter,
Tanja Nicole Zimmermann-Burgerstein
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Stefan Rüdisüli,
Urs Melchior Aegerter,
Tanja Nicole Zimmermann-Burgerstein
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.02.1975
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wollerau
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.001.062-4
UID/VAT
CHE-102.679.868
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Anlage und Verwaltung von Kapitalanlagen und die Erbringung von Beratungsfunktionen im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AEGERTER+BRÄNDLE AG für Steuer- und Wirtschaftsberatung | Rapperswil-Jona | <2004 | 26.11.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Meritum AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004895615, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Meritum AG, in Glarus, CHE-102.679.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2019, Publ. 1004769004). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Wollerau im Handelsregister des Kantons Schwyz eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Glarus von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004895577, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Meritum AG, bisher in Glarus, CHE-102.679.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2019, Publ. 1004769004).
Statutenänderung:
14.05.2020.
Sitz neu:
Wollerau.
Domizil neu:
Fürtistrasse 7, 8832 Wollerau.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Landolt, Dr. Karljörg, von Glarus Nord, in Näfels (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zimmermann-Burgerstein, Tanja Nicole, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Rapperswil-Jona, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Zimmermann, Tanja Nicole];
Aegerter, Urs Melchior, von Oberwil im Simmental, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüdisüli, Daniel, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004769004, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Meritum AG, in Glarus, CHE-102.679.868, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2019, Publ. 1004663591).
Statutenänderung:
21.11.2019.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Anlage und Verwaltung von Kapitalanlagen und die Erbringung von Beratungsfunktionen im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Aktien neu:
50 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 50 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 21.11.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
AEGERTER+BRÄNDLE AG für Steuer- und Wirtschaftsberatung (CHE-105.827.941), in Rapperswil SG (Rapperswil-Jona), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.