Reports for Meco SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Meco SA
- Meco SA with its legal headquarters in Grenchen is active. Meco SA operates in the sector «Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments».
- The management of the company Meco SA, which was founded on the 27.10.1969, consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 06.09.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-101.363.173.
- 3 various trademarks or applications have been registered by the company Meco SA in the IPI.
Management (5)
newest board members
Daniel Peter Ernst Everts,
Thierry Robert Kenel,
Georges Nicolas Hayek jun.
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Peter Ernst Everts,
Hervé Jean-Louis André Avril,
Roland Schmidt,
Thierry Robert Kenel,
Georges Nicolas Hayek jun.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.10.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grenchen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-254.3.000.374-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.363.173
CHE-116.294.121 VAT
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung von und Handel mit Komponenten der Uhrenbranche, insbesondere im Bereich der Uhrenkronen, Uhrendrückern und Gehäusebestandteilen. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, Liegenschaften im In- und Ausland zu erwerben, zu belasten und zu verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | 30.11.1999 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Meco SA Grenchen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
FLEX-PUSH | 10.06.2014 | active | 56379/2014 |
MECO | 22.03.2013 | active | 64297/2012 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Meco SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006123810, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Meco SA, in Grenchen, CHE-101.363.173, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 171 vom 05.09.2022, Publ. 1005554453).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiger, Peter Rudolf, von Flawil, in Jegenstorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Everts, Daniel, von Luzern, in Ittigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005554453, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Meco SA, in Grenchen, CHE-101.363.173, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2022, Publ. 1005530120).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Avril, Hervé Jean-Louis André, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Grenchen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Les Breuleux].
Publication number: HR02-1005530120, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Meco SA, in Grenchen, CHE-101.363.173, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2021, Publ. 1005349910).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Everts, Daniel, von Luzern, in Ittigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bern].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.