Reports for MBI Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MBI Holding AG
- MBI Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Bäch SZ and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of investment companies».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 20.10.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SZ under the UID CHE-106.479.417.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.06.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wollerau
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.006.360-5
UID/VAT
CHE-106.479.417
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Übernahme und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen sowie deren Finanzierung; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten; kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MBI Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005587350, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
MBI Holding AG, in Wollerau, CHE-106.479.417, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2010, S.14, Publ. 5841064).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Häusler, Auguste, von Pfäffikon, in Pfäffikon ZH, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ganter, Bernhard Ernst, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Furtwangen im Schwarzwald (DE), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Häusler, Dr. Peter, von Pfäffikon, in Freienbach, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5841064, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
MBI Holding AG, in Wollerau, CH-130.0.006.360-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 04.08.2009, S. 18, Publ. 5178454).
Statutenänderung:
24.09.2010.
Zweck neu:
Übernahme und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen sowie deren Finanzierung;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten;
kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Publication number: 5178454, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
MBI Holding AG, in Wollerau, CH-130.0.006.360-5, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2001, S. 5696).
Statutenänderung:
24.06.2009.
Zweck neu:
Übernahme und Verwaltung von Beteiligungen sowie deren Finanzierung;
operiert als Managerfirma, d.h. sie erbringt Ingenieurleistungen sowie generelle Dienstleistungen und Beratungen gegenüber Tochtergesellschaften und Dritten;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre durch eingeschriebenen Brief. [Weitere Statutenänderungen sind nicht publikationspflichtig.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 25.5.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Renato Häusler, in Uster, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Häusler, Dr. Peter, von Pfäffikon, in Bäch SZ, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Pfäffikon ZH].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.