Reports for MAXECO Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MAXECO Sàrl
- MAXECO Sàrl with its legal headquarters in Crissier is a Limited liability company from the sector «Services for banks and credit institutions». MAXECO Sàrl is active.
- The management of the company MAXECO Sàrl consists of one person.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 07.05.2010. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company MAXECO Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-113.607.548.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Bahia café Sàrl, Brokers Associates Sàrl, Cafés Manuel, Franzolin.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.05.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Crissier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.050.364-8
UID/VAT
CHE-113.607.548
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conseils dans le domaine économique; courtage de tout produit financier et d'assurance; exploitation d'un ou plusieurs bureaux fiduciaires; gestion immobilière; conseils et formation dans ces domaines.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MAXECO Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5622912, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
MAXECO Sàrl, à Crissier, CH-550-1050364-8, conseils dans le domaine économique (FOSC du 17.03.2009, p. 18/4930110). Benrich Chiheb, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 10 parts de CHF 1'00 à l'associée-gérante Ajra Amine, maintenant de Provence, à La Sarraz, désormais titulaire de 20 parts de CHF 1'000, laquelle reste seule gérante et continue à signer individuellement. Statuts modifiés le 29 avril 2010.
Nouveau but:
conseils dans le domaine économique;
courtage de tout produit financier et d'assurance;
exploitation d'un ou plusieurs bureaux fiduciaires;
gestion immobilière;
conseils et formation dans ces domaines.
Publication number: 4930110, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
MAXECO Sàrl, à Cully, CH-550-1050364-8, conseils dans le domaine économique (FOSC du 16.05.2007, p. 16/3933494). Statuts modifiés le 26 février 2009. Siège transféré à 1023 Crissier, chemin de l'Esparcette 5.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Selon déclaration des gérants du 26 février 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. le capital social de CHF 20'000 est désormais divisé en 20 parts de CHF 1'000. Ajra Manon, qui n'est plus associée, cède ses 2 parts de CHF 1'000 (précédemment 1 part de CHF 2'000), à raison de 1 part chacun à l'associé Benrich Chiheb, élu gérant-président avec signature individuelle, et à l'associé-gérant Ajra Amine, nommé secrétaire, tous deux désormais titulaires de 10 parts de CHF 1'000 (précédemment 1 part de CHF 9'000).
Publication number: 3933494, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
MAXECO Sàrl, à Cully, CH-550-1050364-8, conseils dans le domaine économique (FOSC du 09.05.2007, p. 16). Rectificatif. L'associé-gérant se prénomme Ajra Amine (et non Ajra Armine comme publié).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.