Head office
Other branches (1)
Reports for Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG
- Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG is a Branch with head office in Switzerland with its legal headquarters in Sissach. Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG belongs to the industry «Work on scaffolding» and is currently active.
- Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG has 0 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 10.05.2011.
- The reported UID is CHE-312.913.021.
- There are 11 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Alpha Control 1 GmbH, DIE TROCKNER.CH GmbH, Elektro Brönnimann AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.03.2002
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Sissach
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.9.005.336-1
UID/VAT
CHE-312.913.021
CHE-101.156.266 VAT
Sector
Work on scaffolding
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf und Verkauf, Vermietung, Montage und Demontage von Gerüstmaterial sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen, welche gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften kaufen oder verkaufen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kneubühler Max Gerüstbau AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6155306, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG, in Sissach, CH-280.9.005.336-1, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 30.03.2005, S. 4, Publ. 2768128).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Niederbipp (HR Emmental-Oberaargau).
Statuten Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichenes Statutendatum am Hauptsitz aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Registrierung Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Handelsregisterangabe des Hauptsitzes aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kneubühler, Samuel, von Bleienbach, in Oensingen, Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Müller, Rudolf, von Basel, in Zunzgen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zürcher, Roland, von Basel, in Lausen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2768128, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG, in Sissach, CH-280.9.005.336-1, Kauf und Verkauf, Vermietung, Montage und Demontage von Gerüstmaterial, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2005, S. 6, Publ. 2668804).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Niederbipp.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zürcher, Roland, von Basel, in Lausen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2668804, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Max Kneubühler Gerüstbau AG, in Sissach, CH-280.9.005.336-1, Kauf und Verkauf, Vermietung, Montage und Demontage von Gerüstmaterial, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2002, S. 4).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Niederbipp.
Statuten Hauptsitz neu:
23.12.2004.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kneubühler, Samuel, von Bleienbach, in Oensingen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Niederbipp, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates];
Müller, Rudolf, von Basel, in Zunzgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift].