Reports for Markenfilm Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Markenfilm Schweiz AG
- Markenfilm Schweiz AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production, rental and distribution of films and TV shows ».
- The company was founded on 05.08.2005 and has 5 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.06.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-112.473.400.
- On the same address as Markenfilm Schweiz AG there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Dentallabor W. Fritz GmbH, F & S Career Consulting GmbH, Jennifer Schultz Productions.
Management (5)
newest board members
Ulrich Scheper,
Tina Angela Käthe Rademcher-Scheele,
Johannes Bittel
newest authorized signatories
Ulrich Scheper,
Florian Studer,
Joel Tobias Scheidegger,
Tina Angela Käthe Rademcher-Scheele,
Johannes Bittel
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.08.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.028.978-0
UID/VAT
CHE-112.473.400
Sector
Production, rental and distribution of films and TV shows
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion von Filmen und die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Filmgeschäft. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Gesellschaften und Unternehmen gründen oder sich an solchen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die der Zweck der Gesellschaft mit sich bringen kann, insbesondere Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, überbauen, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 05.04.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alta Group AG | Zug | 11.08.2005 | 04.04.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Markenfilm Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005779910, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Markenfilm Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.473.400, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 22.06.2020, Publ. 1004915892).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheidegger, Joel, von Basel, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Scheper, Ulrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Studer, Florian, von Breitenbach, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004915892, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Markenfilm Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.473.400, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 17.04.2019, Publ. 1004612378).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reinacher-Amstutz, Heinrich, von Zürich, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bittel, Johannes, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Rademcher-Scheele, Tina Angela Käthe, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hamburg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004612378, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Markenfilm Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.473.400, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 05.04.2016, S.0, Publ. 2759155).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bittel, Jörg, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bittel, Johannes, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hamburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Scheper, Ulrich, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.