Reports for Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung
- Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung with its legal headquarters in Sur is active. Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung operates in the sector «Other social services».
- The organization was founded on 08.07.1978 and has 6 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 10.01.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung is the following: CHE-100.662.940.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Roger Demarmels,
Katia Cotti,
Marietta Dedual,
Leo Josef Thomann,
Karin Hersche
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.07.1978
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Surses
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.7.000.061-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.662.940
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Förderung und die Unterstützung sozialer, gemeinnütziger und wohltätiger Werke und Einrichtungen in der Gemeinde Surses.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005377242, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung, in Surses, CHE-100.662.940, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 39 vom 26.02.2020, Publ. 1004839274).
Domizil neu:
c/o Katja Cotti, Tgacrest 28, 7456 Sur.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dosch, Mario, von Surses, in Surses, Mitglied (Aktuar und Kassier), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Giovanoli, Alberto, von Bregaglia, in Surses, Vizepräsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schaniel, Gion-Franzestg, von Surses, in Surses, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dedual, Marietta, von Surses, in Surses, Aktuarin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Cotti, Katja, von Surses, in Surses, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Demarmels, Roger, von Surses, in Surses, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004839274, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung, in Surses, CHE-100.662.940, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2018, Publ. 4363569).
Domizil neu:
c/o Herrn Mario Dosch , Sumvei 19, 7453 Tinizong [Behördliche Umadressierung].
Publication number: 4363569, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Marietta Businger-Dosch-Stiftung, in Surses, CHE-100.662.940, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 180 vom 16.09.2016, Publ. 3059119).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Guetg, Domenik, von Savognin, in Savognin, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dosch, Mario, von Surses, in Surses, Mitglied (Aktuar und Kassier), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Tinizong-Rona, in Tinizong-Rona];
Thomann, Leo, von Pfäfers, in Surses, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Riom-Parsonz, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Giovanoli, Alberto, von Bregaglia, in Surses, Vizepräsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Bivio, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Hersche, Karin, von Appenzell, in Surses, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schaniel, Gion-Franzestg, von Surses, in Surses, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Tinizong-Rona, in Tinizong-Rona].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.