Address
c/o Markus Meier, Rechtsanwalt und Notar
Spitalplatz 6
6460 Altdorf UR
Reports for Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung
- Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung from Altdorf UR operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The organization was founded on 06.11.2009 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 23.05.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register UR under the UID CHE-115.189.160.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Gemelli AG, Herrenknecht Schweiz Holding AG, Imotel AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.11.2009
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Altdorf (UR)
Commercial Registry Office
UR
Commercial register number
CH-120.7.000.007-7
UID/VAT
CHE-115.189.160
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung fördert alle Tätigkeiten, welche irgendwie mit dem Komponisten Johann Simon Mayr, 1763 - 1845, geb. in Mensdorf bei Altmannstein (bei Ingolstadt), gest. in Bergamo, verbunden sind. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinerlei Erwerbszweck und strebt keinen Gewinn an.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Margarete de Bassus-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005751564, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung, in Altdorf (UR), CHE-115.189.160, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 17.12.2018, Publ. 1004522278).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
de Bassus, Margarete, von Poschiavo, in Bäch SZ(Freienbach), Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Markus, von Reiden, in Altdorf (UR), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Meier, Lucia, von Reiden, in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004522278, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung, in Altdorf (UR), CHE-115.189.160, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2011, Publ. 6011458).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Markus, von Reiden, in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Seedorf (UR)].
Publication number: 6011458, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Margarete de Bassus-Stiftung, in Altdorf UR, CH-120.7.000.007-7, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 12.11.2009, S. 21, Publ. 5339518).
Urkundenänderung:
22.12.2010.
Name neu:
Margarete Baronin de Bassus-Stiftung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.