Reports for ManpowerGroup SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ManpowerGroup SA
- ManpowerGroup SA is active in the industry «Business management and administration» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Morges.
- There are 7 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 22.03.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-102.720.063.
Management (7)
newest board members
Eric Alexandre Marie Jeannerod,
Etleva Ott,
Donald Olvis Mondano
newest authorized signatories
Eric Alexandre Marie Jeannerod,
Emma Lucy Pasea,
Nina Fiona Rueschen,
Peter Wassmer,
Etleva Ott
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.02.1962
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-660.3.968.789-7
UID/VAT
CHE-102.720.063
CHE-116.287.902 VAT
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but de fournir des services de gestion et de formation et des conseils en matière de management de personnel et de déployer toute activité directement ou indirectement liée à ce but; l'administration et l'exécution de tous types de transactions financières; l'acquisition et l'administration de participations de tous genres, la fondation de filiales et succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger et le financement de sociétés (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Genève | 31.07.2006 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | <2004 | 30.07.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- ManpowerGroup AG
- ManpowerGroup Ltd
- Manpower Holding AG
- Manpower Holding SA
- Manpower AG
- Manpower AG.
- Manpower SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ManpowerGroup SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005992792, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ManpowerGroup SA, à Morges, CHE-102.720.063 (FOSC du 10.01.2024, p. 0/1005930925). Scabbio Stefano et Jacob Jan ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Jeannerod Eric, de France, à Versailles (France), est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005930925, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ManpowerGroup SA, à Morges, CHE-102.720.063 (FOSC du 28.12.2023, p. 0/1005922351). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Pasea Emma, du Royaume-Uni, à Lancy.
Publication number: HR02-1005922351, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
ManpowerGroup SA, à Morges, CHE-102.720.063 (FOSC du 29.09.2023, p. 0/1005849106). Hahn Igor, Fontana Giovanna et Grijalba Perez Alfaro Raul ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.