Branches (62)
Reports for Manpower SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Manpower SA
- Manpower SA from Morges operates in the sector «Temp agency services» and is active.
- Manpower SA was founded on 28.07.1997.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 15.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-105.999.625.
Management (13)
newest board members
Eric Alexandre Marie Jeannerod,
Etleva Ott,
Donald Olvis Mondano
newest authorized signatories
Anthony Bernard,
Eric Alexandre Marie Jeannerod,
Christian Hoffmann,
Jean-Claude Pattiselanno,
Räto Casanova
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.07.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Morges
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.021.530-2
UID/VAT
CHE-105.999.625
CHE-116.287.902 VAT
Sector
Temp agency services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la recherche, la sélection, le conseil et la formation de personnel, c.-à-d. la mise à disposition de personnel pour des postes permanents, temporaires et à temps partiel, la prise en charge et la gestion du personnel sur demande, l'administration des salaires et tous les travaux liés aux contrats d'externalisation (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Genève | 31.07.2006 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Genève | <2004 | 30.07.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Manpower Ltd
- Manpower AG
- Manpower SpA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Manpower SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006107605, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Manpower SA, à Morges, CHE-105.999.625 (FOSC du 22.03.2024, p. 0/1005992791). La signature de Augusto Mathilde est radiée. Signature collective à deux, limitée au siège principal, est conférée à Bernard Anthony, de France, à Mont-Vully.
Publication number: HR02-1005992791, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Manpower SA, à Morges, CHE-105.999.625 (FOSC du 10.01.2024, p. 0/1005930922). Scabbio Stefano et Jacob Jan ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Jeannerod Eric, de France, à Versailles (France), est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005930922, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Manpower SA, à Morges, CHE-105.999.625 (FOSC du 28.12.2023, p. 0/1005922350). La signature de Mösching Ronald est radiée. Pasea Emma n'est plus directrice.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.