Reports for Manfred Hegglin AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Manfred Hegglin AG
- Manfred Hegglin AG has its legal headquarters in Baar and is active. It operates in the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles».
- The management of the company Manfred Hegglin AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 24.06.1969.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 30.09.2020. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-106.919.221.
Management (3)
newest board members
Manuela Räber-Hegglin,
Manfred Reto Hegglin,
Sandro Silvio Hegglin
newest authorized signatories
Manuela Räber-Hegglin,
Manfred Reto Hegglin,
Sandro Silvio Hegglin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.06.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baar
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.001.644-3
UID/VAT
CHE-106.919.221
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung eines Garagebetriebes mit Autoservicestelle, Ausführung von Reparaturen aller Art, Spenglerei- und Autoservicearbeiten, An- und Verkauf von Automobilen, Ersatzteilen und Zubehör aller Art, autogewerbliche Tätigkeiten aller Art sowie Betrieb einer Tankstelle; kann Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIGAS Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG | Köniz | 07.08.2007 | 07.10.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hegglin Manfred AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Manfred Hegglin AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004989066, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Manfred Hegglin AG, in Baar, CHE-106.919.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 22.09.2017, Publ. 3767179).
Domizil neu:
Langgasse 6, 6340 Baar.
Publication number: 3767179, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Manfred Hegglin AG, in Baar, CHE-106.919.221, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2009, Publ. 5283380).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hegglin, Manfred, von Menzingen, in Hausen am Albis, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Räber-Hegglin, Manuela, von Menzingen und Merenschwand, in Hausen am Albis, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Menzingen und Benzenschwil, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hegglin, Manfred Reto, von Menzingen, in Steinhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hegglin, Sandro Silvio, von Menzingen, in Hausen am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5283380, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Manfred Hegglin AG, in Baar, CH-170.3.001.644-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 150 vom 07.08.2007, S. 16, Publ. 4056508).
Statutenänderung:
23.09.2009.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB, durch eingeschriebenen Brief, gegen Empfangsbestätigung oder telegrafisch.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 23.09.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Änderung einer nicht publikationspflichtigen Tatsache.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
FIGAS Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG, in Köniz, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.