Reports for LZ IRRI AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LZ IRRI AG
- LZ IRRI AG from Zürich operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The management of the company LZ IRRI AG, which was founded on the 11.05.2006, consists of 3 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 05.07.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-112.927.861.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.05.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.029.849-0
UID/VAT
CHE-112.927.861
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der An- und Verkauf, die Überbauung und die Verwaltung von Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, alle Geschäfte zu tätigen, die nach Ansicht des Verwaltungsrates mit dem genannten Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen oder in ihrem Interesse als geboten erscheinen. Sie kann weitere Gesellschaften gründen, sich in beliebiger Form bei solchen beteiligen und andere bei sich beteiligen lassen, oder mit anderen Gesellschaftern fusionieren. Der Verwaltungsrat ist berechtigt, an anderen Orten des In- und Auslandes Zweigniederlassungen zu errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Confides AG | Gossau (SG) | 19.05.2017 | 24.09.2020 | |
Treuhand AG Gossau | Gossau (SG) | 17.05.2006 | 18.05.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LZ IRRI AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006076529, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LZ IRRI AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.927.861, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 02.10.2020, Publ. 1004990866).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fehrenbach-Müller, Irène, von Morissen und Schmerikon, in Steinach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ammann, Reto, von Lumnezia, in Teufen (AR), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ammann, Désirée, von Lumnezia, in Gossau (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schaniel, Prisca, von Lumnezia und Surses, in Niederwil (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004990866, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LZ IRRI AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.927.861, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 25.09.2020, Publ. 1004985749).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ammann, Reto, von Lumnezia, in Teufen (AR), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Morissen, in Gossau (SG)].
Publication number: HR02-1004985749, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LZ IRRI AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.927.861, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 19.05.2017, S.0, Publ. 3532175).
Statutenänderung:
31.08.2020.
Aktien neu:
900 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 900 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme bei der Gründung vom 20.03.2006 ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Vertrag vom 20.03.2006 die Liegenschaft Kataster Nr. WO3751, Marchwartstrasse 37, in Zürich, sowie die Liegenschaft Kataster Nr. 1910, Dietlikerstrasse 33 und 35, in Kloten, wofür 900 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben, CHF 270'000.- als Forderung gutgeschrieben und die auf den Liegenschaften lastenden Schuldbriefe in der Höhe von insgesamt CHF 4'095'000.-- übernommen werden.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen der Aktionäre.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 18.09.2020 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Confides AG (CHE-161.312.334), in Gossau SG, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.