Address
c/o Oskar Lusser-Schelbert
Gotthardstrasse 9
6460 Altdorf UR
Reports for Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser
- Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Altdorf UR.
- Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser has 6 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.04.2022.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of UR under the UID CHE-309.905.015.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Alfons Lusser,
Rosmarie Kretz-Lusser,
Stefan Lusser,
Florian Lusser,
Oskar Lusser
newest authorized signatories
Alfons Lusser,
Rosmarie Kretz-Lusser,
Stefan Lusser,
Florian Lusser,
Oskar Lusser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.05.2019
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Altdorf (UR)
Commercial Registry Office
UR
Commercial register number
CH-120.7.000.025-0
UID/VAT
CHE-309.905.015
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck dieser Stiftung ist die Unterstützung lediger, weiblicher Nachkommen des Stammes Florian Lusser-Müller im Falle von Bedürftigkeit sowie die Unterstützung männlicher und weiblicher Nachkommen eben dieses Stammes zu Ausbildungs- und Studienzwecken.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005461372, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser, in Altdorf (UR), CHE-309.905.015, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2019, Publ. 1004632369).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lusser, Rita, von Altdorf (UR), in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser-Herger, Maria, von Altdorf (UR), in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kretz-Lusser, Rosmarie, von Altdorf (UR), in Arth, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Alfons, von Altdorf (UR), in Benken (SG), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR01-1004632369, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Lussersche Familienstiftung der Fräulein Floriane L. Lusser, in Altdorf (UR), CHE-309.905.015, c/o Oskar Lusser-Schelbert, Gotthardstrasse 9, 6460 Altdorf UR, Stiftung (Neueintragung).
Urkundendatum:
28.12.1962.
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Stefan Lusser, Rietstrasse 7, 8807 Freienbach.
Zweck:
Zweck dieser Stiftung ist die Unterstützung lediger, weiblicher Nachkommen des Stammes Florian Lusser-Müller im Falle von Bedürftigkeit sowie die Unterstützung männlicher und weiblicher Nachkommen eben dieses Stammes zu Ausbildungs- und Studienzwecken. Die Stiftung ist eine Familienstiftung, die nicht der staatlichen Aufsicht unterstellt ist und keine Revisionsstelle bezeichnen muss.
Eingetragene Personen:
Lusser, Stefan, von Altdorf (UR), in Freienbach, Mitglied und Verwalter des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Oskar, von Altdorf (UR), in Altdorf (UR), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Florian, von Altdorf (UR), in Uezwil, Mitglied und Protokollführer des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Bruno, von Altdorf (UR), in Pfäffikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser, Rita, von Altdorf (UR), in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lusser-Herger, Maria, von Altdorf (UR), in Altdorf (UR), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.