Reports for Luka Beteiligungen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Luka Beteiligungen AG
- Luka Beteiligungen AG is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in St. Gallen.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 15.06.2012.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 06.08.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Luka Beteiligungen AG is registered under the UID CHE-160.758.822.
- On the same address as Luka Beteiligungen AG there are 11 other active companies registered. These include: Experten Dienstleistung Lux AG, Frei & Gmünder AG, Litex AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.06.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-300.3.017.450-2
UID/VAT
CHE-160.758.822
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die dauernde Verwaltung, die Veräusserung und die Finanzierung von Grundstücken im In- und Ausland sowie von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen aller Art. Sie kann Garantien zugunsten von verbundenen Gesellschaften stellen. Die Gesellschaft kann gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Immaterialgüterrechte, Know-how sowie Exklusivitätsrechte erwerben, verwerten und vermitteln. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die nach Ansicht des Verwaltungsrates direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oderfremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Luka Beteiligungen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004953035, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Luka Beteiligungen AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-160.758.822, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2019, Publ. 1004553369).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fintic, Dejan, von Herisau, in Teufen AR, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004553369, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Luka Beteiligungen AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-160.758.822, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2017, Publ. 3948519).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Banholzer, Ralf, von Leibstadt, in Embrach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Banholzer, Nadja, von Wölflinswil, in Embrach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Velleuer, Marc Dominique, von Zürich, in Pfäffikon SZ (Freienbach), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Fintic, Dejan, von Herisau, in Teufen AR, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schäpper, Ives, von Sevelen und Buchs (SG), in Berneck, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3948439, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Luka Beteiligungen AG, in Herisau, CHE-160.758.822, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 14.07.2017, Publ. 3646015).
Löschungsgrund:
Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach St. Gallen im Handelsregister des Kantons Appenzell Ausserrhoden von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.