Reports for LPP Group AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LPP Group AG
- LPP Group AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Uster. LPP Group AG belongs to the industry «Operation of investment companies» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 28.10.2013.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 01.07.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-185.688.830.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Büchi Beteiligungen AG, LPP Equipment AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uster
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.039.822-5
UID/VAT
CHE-185.688.830
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanzierungs-, Sanierungs- und Interzessionsmassnahmen zu Gunsten von Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten vornehmen, sowie Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten gewähren, auch wenn diese Finanzierungs-, Sanierungs- und Interzessionsmassnahmen, Darlehen oder Sicherheiten unentgeltlich gewährt werden. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | St. Gallen | 31.10.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LPP Group SA
- LPP Group Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LPP Group AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006070941, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LPP Group AG, in Uster, CHE-185.688.830, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 17.05.2022, Publ. 1005475029).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Büchi, Hermann, von Elgg, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Büchi, Werner, von Elgg, in Uster, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Krauer, Dr. Jürg, von Gossau (ZH), in Uster, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005475029, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LPP Group AG, in Uster, CHE-185.688.830, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 14.04.2022, Publ. 1005450861).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlumpf, Oliva, von Zürich, in Uster, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005450861, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LPP Group AG, in Uster, CHE-185.688.830, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 12.12.2019, Publ. 1004781193).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Büchi, Silvio, von Elgg, in Uster, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Büchi, Hermann, von Elgg, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.