Address
c/o Pierre Meyer-Wölki
Reckenbühlstrasse 10
6005 Luzern
Reports for Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung
- Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 08.12.1951.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 14.03.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-110.381.684.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Pierre Meyer-Wölki,
Georges Meyer-Schläpfer,
Karl Martin Meyer,
Jost Meyer-Rieser
newest authorized signatories
Pierre Meyer-Wölki,
Georges Meyer-Schläpfer,
Karl Martin Meyer,
Jost Meyer-Rieser
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.12.1951
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.008.207-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.381.684
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fürsorge für die Familien Jost Meyer-am Rhyn und Emanuel Meyer-Meyer.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Truvag Revisions AG | Kriens | 14.03.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | 24.02.2006 | 13.03.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Meyer Louis Familienstiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005985442, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung, in Luzern, CHE-110.381.684, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 160 vom 21.08.2023, Publ. 1005819912).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BDO AG (CHE-384.263.558), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Truvag Revisions AG (CHE-211.109.228), in Kriens, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005819912, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung, in Luzern, CHE-110.381.684, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 29.04.2019, Publ. 1004618766).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer-Gade Jensen, Emanuel, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer-Wölki, Pierre, von Luzern und Hergiswil (NW), in Hergiswil (NW), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Kurator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Luzern, Präsident, Kurator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004618766, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Louis Meyer-Familienstiftung, in Luzern, CHE-110.381.684, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 14.04.2015, S.0, Publ. 2095851).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der nicht im Handelsregister eingetragenen Familienstiftung Meyer Grundhof Luzern, in Luzern, gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 17.04.2019 und Bilanz per 31.12.2018, Aktiven von CHF 36'064.56 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 4'500.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Stiftung über.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Karl Martin, von Luzern, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.