Reports for LKS Group GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LKS Group GmbH
- LKS Group GmbH with its legal headquarters in Herisau is a Limited liability company from the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road». LKS Group GmbH is active.
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 20.09.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AR under the UID CHE-427.717.251.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: Adoo Group AG, DeinBau AG, Hiram GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.08.2020
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Herisau
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-130.4.028.376-2
UID/VAT
CHE-427.717.251
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den nationalen und internationalen Waren- und Gütertransport; Im- und Export sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen; kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum, Immobilien, Beteiligungen, Wertschriften, Patente, Lizenzen, Markenrechte, Know-how erwerben, belasten, verwalten, vermieten und veräussern; kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LKS Group GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005841575, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Fönsi GmbH, in Arth, CHE-427.717.251, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2020, Publ. 1004956202). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Herisau (neu firmierend: LKS Group GmbH) im Handelsregister des Kantons Schwyz von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005841794, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Fönsi GmbH, bisher in Arth, CHE-427.717.251, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2020, Publ. 1004956202).
Statutenänderung:
11.09.2023.
Firma neu:
LKS Group GmbH.
Sitz neu:
Herisau.
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofplatz 10, 9100 Herisau.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den nationalen und internationalen Waren- und Gütertransport;
Im- und Export sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen;
kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum, Immobilien, Beteiligungen, Wertschriften, Patente, Lizenzen, Markenrechte, Know-how erwerben, belasten, verwalten, vermieten und veräussern;
kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fürst, Christian Matthias, von Tecknau, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weibel, Patrick Roman, von Gams, in Kaltbrunn, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.