Reports for LKS AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LKS AG
- LKS AG with its legal headquarters in Neuenhof is active. LKS AG operates in the sector «Trading with machines».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.01.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-106.503.895.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Urs Burkhardt,
Giorgio R. Roberto Vannotti,
Michael Lauper,
Thomas Studer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.09.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Neuenhof
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.008.600-0
UID/VAT
CHE-106.503.895
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Handel mit Transportsystemen jeglicher Art sowie das Erbringen von Dienstleistungen auf diesem Gebiet. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundbesitz erwerben, veräussern, mieten und vermieten, bewegliche Sachen, immaterielle und andere Rechte erwerben, verwerten, verwalten und veräussern, ähnliche Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich an solchen in beliebiger Form beteiligen, sowie alle Geschäfte vornehmen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen oder Tochterfirmen im In- und Ausland einrichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hüsser Gmür + Partner AG | Baden | 24.12.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Saxer Treuhand AG Baden | Baden | 03.02.2012 | 11.10.2021 | |
Obrist + Rosenberg, Treuhand- & Revisions AG | Baden | <2004 | 02.02.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LKS AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005946632, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
LKS AG, in Neuenhof, CHE-106.503.895, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2022, Publ. 1005569092).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trajkovic, Jovan, von Ebikon, in Dierikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burkhardt, Urs, von Huttwil, in Oftringen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005569092, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
LKS AG, in Neuenhof, CHE-106.503.895, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2021, Publ. 1005367316).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schabrun, Anton, von Attinghausen, in Sarnen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Trajkovic, Jovan, von Ebikon, in Dierikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005367316, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
LKS AG, in Neuenhof, CHE-106.503.895, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 12.10.2021, Publ. 1005310634).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hüsser Gmür + Partner AG (CHE-106.823.621), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.