Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for ISS Facility Services FM AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.2008
Deletion from the commercial register
21.03.2023
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.032.024-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.072.294
Sector
Facility management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen zum Betrieb und Unterhalt von Immobilien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern oder zu erleichtern sowie sich an Unternehmen ähnlicher Art im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 13.02.2008 | 20.03.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Livit FM Services AG
- Livit FM Services SA
- Livit FM Services Ltd.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ISS Facility Services FM AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005705006, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ISS Facility Services FM AG, in Zürich, CHE-114.072.294, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2022, Publ. 1005636817). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die ISS Facility Services AG, in Zürich (CHE-106.101.723), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005636817, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ISS Facility Services FM AG, in Zürich, CHE-114.072.294, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2022, Publ. 1005606234).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frei, Dominik, von Auenstein, in Bellmund, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005606234, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Livit FM Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-114.072.294, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 196 vom 10.10.2022, Publ. 1005578938).
Statutenänderung:
28.10.2022.
Firma neu:
ISS Facility Services FM AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
[Die Übersetzungen werden im Handelsregister gelöscht].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stiebellehner, Wolfgang, von Baar, in Baar, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eichmann, Mathias, von Gommiswald, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lifart, Beatrice, von Zürich und Freienwil, in Oberengstringen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nauer, André, von Bremgarten (AG), in Oberwil-Lieli, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fuchs, Robert, von Val Müstair, in Oberwil-Lieli, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Aebi, Tanja, von Rüderswil, in Thalwil, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Favier-Bosson, Christophe, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Versoix, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ruf, Jochen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Glattfelden, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stefanoni, Marco, von Zürich, in Zürich, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zubler, Martin, von Hunzenschwil, in Ueken, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bickel, Jacqueline, von Ettingen, in Mellingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates oder einem Direktor;
Sicher, Philipp, von Gurtnellen, in Küsnacht (ZH), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates oder einem Direktor.