Branches (1)
Reports for LivaNova Switzerland SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LivaNova Switzerland SA
- LivaNova Switzerland SA is currently active and the industry «Trading in consumer goods». The legal headquarters are in Lausanne.
- The management of the company LivaNova Switzerland SA consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 07.08.2024.
- LivaNova Switzerland SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-108.414.624.
- Next to the company LivaNova Switzerland SA there are 46 other active companies with an identical address. These include: AGC SA, AGI Sàrl, AgroBio Invest Sàrl.
Management (3)
newest board members
Martin Göllner,
Laurent Michel Julien Besso,
Roberto Checchi
newest authorized signatories
Martin Göllner,
Laurent Michel Julien Besso,
Roberto Checchi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.03.1996
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.012.028-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.414.624
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce d'appareils électriques et électroniques, ainsi que leurs composants et accessoires, à usage médical, paramédical ou de secours, soit stimulateurs cardiaques et autres, appareils de surveillance intensive, de secours et d'aide au diagnostic; coordonner la production des différentes usines, le réseau, les agents et les distributeurs des produits, le recouvrement des créances des clients, la gestion du stock des usines et des centres de distribution, et la gestion des services communs au sein du groupe Sorin.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 26.11.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 25.11.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sorin Group International SA
- Ela médical SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LivaNova Switzerland SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006101880, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
LivaNova Switzerland SA, à Lausanne, CHE-108.414.624 (FOSC du 10.08.2021, p. 0/1005268292). Montag Susanne n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Göllner Martin, d'Allemagne, à Münich (Allemagne), est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005268292, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
LivaNova Switzerland SA, à Lausanne, CHE-108.414.624 (FOSC du 02.03.2021, p. 0/1005113593). Borelli Maurizio n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Montag Susanne est nommée présidente. Besso Laurent, de Zürich, à Féchy, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005113593, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
LivaNova Switzerland SA, à Lausanne, CHE-108.414.624 (FOSC du 15.02.2019, p. 0/1004568017). Neumann Alexander n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Borelli Maurizio est nommé président. Checchi Roberto, de Italie, à Ferrara (Italie), et Montag Susanne, de Allemagne, à Anzing (Allemagne), sont membres du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.