Branches (1)
Reports for Lisignoli AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lisignoli AG
- Lisignoli AG is currently active and the industry «Other construction». The legal headquarters are in Bad Ragaz.
- Lisignoli AG was founded on 01.01.1978.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 06.07.2022.
- Lisignoli AG is registered in the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-106.021.490.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Philipp Ferdinand Hasler,
René Good,
Thomas Good,
Walter Zwyssig
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bad Ragaz
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.035.840-8
UID/VAT
CHE-106.021.490
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung, Ausführung und Erstellung von Energie- und Gebäudetechnikanlagen, wie Heizungs-, Lüftungs-, Klima-, Kälte-, Sanitär- und Alternativenergieanlagen inkl. Ausführung der diesbezüglichen Wartungs- und Servicearbeiten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum im In- und Ausland erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Prefera Audit AG | Sargans | 06.08.2012 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wälti Treuhand und Revisionen AG in Liquidation | Bad Ragaz | <2004 | 05.08.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Lisignoli Franco
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lisignoli AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005514163, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lisignoli AG, in Bad Ragaz, CHE-106.021.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2019, Publ. 1004555526).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bigger, Stephan, von Vilters-Wangs, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hasler, Philipp Ferdinand, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Gamprin (LI), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Good, René, von Mels, in Mels, Geschäftsführer, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Prefera Audit AG (CHE-110.139.812), in Sargans, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Prefera Audit AG]. [Anpassung betr. Revisionsstelle aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften].
Publication number: HR02-1004555526, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lisignoli AG, in Bad Ragaz, CHE-106.021.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 16.05.2018, Publ. 4231417).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bigger, Stephan, von Vilters-Wangs, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hasler, Philipp Ferdinand, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Gamprin (LI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Good, René, von Mels, in Mels, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Good, Thomas, von Mels, in Mels, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4231417, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Lisignoli AG, in Bad Ragaz, CHE-106.021.490, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 09.06.2017, Publ. 3570501).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walser, Werner, von Quarten, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.