Reports for lintharena ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout lintharena ag
- lintharena ag in Näfels is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Sport services». lintharena ag is active.
- lintharena ag was founded on 12.11.2020.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 24.09.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company lintharena ag is the following: CHE-455.713.086.
Management (10)
newest board members
Alexandra Hefti,
Richard Jakob Eberhard,
Marco Domenico Rimini,
Thomas Spengler,
Kaspar Krieg-Reicherter
newest authorized signatories
Alexandra Hefti,
Richard Jakob Eberhard,
Silvan Peter Dietrich,
Tanja Büsser,
Marco Domenico Rimini
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.11.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.006.647-2
UID/VAT
CHE-455.713.086
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung von Sport- und Freizeitanlagen und branchenverwandten Betrieben inkl. den dazugehörenden Nebenanlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft ist insoweit berechtigt und verpflichtet, gewinnstrebend zu handeln, als die grundsätzliche Vorrangstellung der gemeinwirtschaftlichen Bedürfnisse und vorab das sportliche Interesse der Leistungsempfangenden vor den kommerziellen Interessen der Gesellschaft angemessen gewahrt bleiben. Allfällige Gewinne die erzielt werden, sind ausschliesslich zur langfristigen Sicherstellung des Gesellschaftszweckes einzurichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SMART Audit AG | Glarus Nord | 24.09.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Glaronia Treuhand AG | Glarus Nord | 17.11.2020 | 23.09.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: lintharena ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006136561, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
lintharena ag, in Glarus Nord, CHE-455.713.086, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 06.05.2024, Publ. 1006025465).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Glaronia Treuhand AG (CHE-106.897.016), in Ziegelbrücke (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
SMART Audit AG (CHE-395.587.404), in Ziegelbrücke (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1006025465, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
lintharena ag, in Glarus Nord, CHE-455.713.086, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 10.08.2023, Publ. 1005813753).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hager, Adrian, von Glarus Nord, in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hefti, Alexandra, von Glarus, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005813753, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
lintharena ag, in Glarus Nord, CHE-455.713.086, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 148 vom 03.08.2023, Publ. 1005809161).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jenni, Gérard Jean, von Zürich, in Wermatswil (Uster), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eberhard, Richard, von Schänis, in Niederurnen (Glarus Nord), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gallati, Patrik, von Glarus Nord, in Näfels (Glarus Nord), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Dietrich, Silvan, von Nürensdorf, in Nürensdorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.