Reports for LIMA Solar AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LIMA Solar AG
- LIMA Solar AG from Wil SG operates in the sector «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances» and is active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 15.12.2015.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 05.07.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-328.145.368.
- On the same address as LIMA Solar AG there are 13 other active companies registered. These include: BH Brandschutz Bruno Häseli, Constant Design, DIMA Holding AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Alessia Simeone,
Alexander Dieter Schenk,
Thomas Feller,
Dieter Max Schenk
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wil (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.079.029-1
UID/VAT
CHE-328.145.368
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Planung, den Bau und den Betrieb von Anlagen betreffend Gewinnung und Speicherung erneuerbaren Energien. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im ln- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im ln- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im ln- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | St. Gallen | 22.02.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SUMA Immobilien AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LIMA Solar AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006077227, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
LIMA Solar AG, in Wil (SG), CHE-328.145.368, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2023, Publ. 1005874135).
Domizil neu:
Glärnischstrasse 13, 9500 Wil SG.
Publication number: HR02-1005874135, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
LIMA Solar AG, in Wil (SG), CHE-328.145.368, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 10.08.2023, Publ. 1005813934).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Surbeck, Reto, von Zürich, in Forch (Maur), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005813934, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
LIMA Solar AG, in Wil (SG), CHE-328.145.368, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2023, Publ. 1005709858).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schenk, Alexander Dieter, von Merenschwand, in Wil SG, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Simeone, Alessia, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Algetshausen (Uzwil), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Surbeck, Reto, von Zürich, in Forch (Maur), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.