Reports for Lico Suisse AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lico Suisse AG
- Lico Suisse AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Meggen. Lico Suisse AG belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- Lico Suisse AG was founded on 18.09.2019.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 07.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-383.089.542.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Performance041 GmbH, Refinval AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Paul Lingg,
Christine Doris Rebsamen-Bärtschi,
Edwin Lingg,
Thomas Josef Rebsamen
newest authorized signatories
Paul Lingg,
Christine Doris Rebsamen-Bärtschi,
Edwin Lingg,
Thomas Josef Rebsamen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.09.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Meggen
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.808.393-0
UID/VAT
CHE-383.089.542
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produktion von, Handel mit und Verkauf von Bodenbelägen sowie Waren aller Art; Erwerb, Halten sowie Veräusserung von Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Sursee | 23.09.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lico Suisse AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006101584, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lico Suisse AG, in Meggen, CHE-383.089.542, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 23.09.2019, Publ. 1004721392).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schärli, Alois, von Sempach, in Sempach, Vizepräsident und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lingg, Alfred, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Mals (IT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lingg, Paul, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Mals (IT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rebsamen-Bärtschi, Christine, von Rothenburg, in Sursee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR01-1004721392, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lico Suisse AG, in Meggen, CHE-383.089.542, Tannenbodenstrasse 8, 6045 Meggen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
16.09.2019.
Zweck:
Produktion von, Handel mit und Verkauf von Bodenbelägen sowie Waren aller Art;
Erwerb, Halten sowie Veräusserung von Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Belastung, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schärli, Alois, von Sempach, in Sempach, Vizepräsident und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lingg, Alfred, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Mals (IT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lingg, Edwin, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schluderns (IT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rebsamen, Thomas, von Hochdorf, in Ennetbürgen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BDO AG (CHE-295.361.041), in Sursee, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.