Reports for Lichtplaner.ch GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lichtplaner.ch GmbH
- Lichtplaner.ch GmbH in Bern is a Limited liability company from the sector «Other construction». Lichtplaner.ch GmbH is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 27.03.2008.
- The last commercial register change was made on 03.09.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-114.146.685.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.03.2008
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.041.595-3
UID/VAT
CHE-114.146.685
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt alle Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Beleuchtung und der Lichtplanung anzubieten. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lichtplaner.ch GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005283554, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lichtplaner.ch GmbH, in Bern, CHE-114.146.685, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 239 vom 10.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1871947).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kienberger, Hans Peter, von Oftringen, in Bern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schlachter, Manon Kim, von Bern, in Islikon (Gachnang), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 1871947, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lichtplaner.ch GmbH, in Bern, CHE-114.146.685, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 01.12.2009, S. 4, Publ. 5369204).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kienberger, Hans Peter, von Oftringen, in Bern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Kirchlindach].
Publication number: 5369204, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 222 vom 16.11.2009, S. 5, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 15'361 vom 10.11.2009. Lichtplaner.ch GmbH, in Bern, CH-036.4.041.595-3, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 16.11.2009, S. 5, Publ. 5343602).
Domizil neu:
Mühlenplatz 12, 3011 Bern.