Reports for Libala SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Libala SA
- Libala SA is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Montreux.
- The management of the company Libala SA consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 23.02.2018.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-104.003.914.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.06.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Montreux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.065.466-9
UID/VAT
CHE-104.003.914
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but, dans le strict respect des dispositions légales relatives à l'achat d'immeubles en Suisse par des personnes à l'étranger: l'exploitation d'hôtels et d'instituts; la gérance, l'administration, l'exploitation, l'achat, la vente, la mise en valeur et la rénovation de tous immeubles, bâtis ou non, et de tous droits immobiliers; le courtage en immeubles et en fonds de commerce; le conseil et l'expertise dans les domaines économique, financier, fiscal et juridique, principalement dans le secteur immobilier (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Meichtry | Montreux | 10.05.2011 | 19.10.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Surval S.A.
- Surval SA
- Anmo Ski- und Touristik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Libala SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4075467, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Libala SA, à Montreux, CHE-104.003.914 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 8 février 2018.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but, dans le strict respect des dispositions légales relatives à l'achat d'immeubles en Suisse par des personnes à l'étranger: l'exploitation d'hôtels et d'instituts;
la gérance, l'administration, l'exploitation, l'achat, la vente, la mise en valeur et la rénovation de tous immeubles, bâtis ou non, et de tous droits immobiliers;
le courtage en immeubles et en fonds de commerce;
le conseil et l'expertise dans les domaines économique, financier, fiscal et juridique, principalement dans le secteur immobilier (pour but complet cf. statuts). Fauquex Jean-Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouveaux administrateurs avec signature individuelle:
Lustenberger Dominique, de Romoos, à Montreux, président, et Beaud Michel, de La Verrerie, à Pully, secrétaire.
Publication number: 987439, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Libala SA, à Montreux, CH-550-0065466-9 (FOSC du 20.10.2011, p. 0/6384440).
Nouvelle adresse:
avenue de Nestlé 2, 1820 Montreux.
Publication number: 6384440, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Surval S.A., à Montreux, CH-550-0065466-9, exploitation d'hôtels et d'instituts (FOSC du 10.05.2011, p. 0/6154598). Statuts modifiés le 28 septembre 2011.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Libala SA. Selon déclaration du 28 septembre 2011, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. Charles Meichtry (CH-550-0046468-8) n'est plus organe de révision. Par suite de fusion de communes, Fauquex Jean-Pierre est maintenant de Bourg-en-Lavaux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.