Address
Route des Deux-Villages 59
1806 St-Légier-La Chiésaz
Reports for Liaudat SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Liaudat SA
- Liaudat SA has its legal headquarters in St-Légier-La Chiésaz, is active and operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The management of the company Liaudat SA, which was founded on the 13.07.1956, consists of 2 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 21.04.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Liaudat SA is the following: CHE-101.615.110.
- Companies with an identical address: Kalms informatique, Sorrentino sanitaire et chauffage S.A., Taxi Chaplin & Oriental Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.07.1956
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Blonay - Saint-Légier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.050.514-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.615.110
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exécution de travaux d'installations sanitaires, appareillage, chauffage, ventilation, ferblanterie et couverture. Tubage de cheminées.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Jean-Christophe Gross | Vevey | 11.03.2009 | 19.07.2012 | |
Fiduciaire W. Winkler Sàrl | Villeneuve (VD) | 06.06.2005 | 10.03.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Liaudat S.A.
- Liaudat & Schenk SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Liaudat SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005455741, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Liaudat S.A., à Saint-Légier-La Chiésaz, CHE-101.615.110 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Siège devenu Blonay - Saint-Légier.
Publication number: 5509806, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Liaudat S.A., à Saint-Légier-La Chiésaz, CH-550-0050514-5, exécution de travaux d'installations sanitaires, appareillage, chauffage, ventilation, ferblanterie et couverture (FOSC du 11.03.2009, p. 20/4921196).
Nouvelle adresse:
route des Deux-Villages 59, 1806 St-Légier-Chiésaz.
Publication number: 4921196, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Liaudat S.A., à Saint-Légier-La Chiésaz, CH-550-0050514-5, exécution de travaux d'installations sanitaires (FOSC du 06.06.2005, p. 15/2867966). Fiduciaire W. Winkler Sàrl n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fiduciaire Jean-Christophe Gross (CH-550-0047106-7), à Vevey.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.