Reports for LIAG CAPITOL AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LIAG CAPITOL AG
- LIAG CAPITOL AG with its legal headquarters in Winterthur is active. LIAG CAPITOL AG operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company LIAG CAPITOL AG consists of 3 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 10.08.2021. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-105.788.459.
Management (3)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Anna-Katharina Hugueniot,
Dr. Hanspeter M. Sigg,
Dr. Maria Claudia Sigg-Farner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.07.1926
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.916.027-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.788.459
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb von Freizeitanlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
a&o kreston audit ag | Zürich | 29.09.2004 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RKT-Trust AG in Liquidation | Glarus | <2004 | 28.09.2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LIAG CAPITOL AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005267719, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LIAG CAPITOL AG, in Winterthur, CHE-105.788.459, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 13.03.2020, Publ. 1004851721).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hugueniot, Anna-Katharina, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sigg, Anna-Katharina].
Publication number: HR02-1004851721, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LIAG CAPITOL AG, in Winterthur, CHE-105.788.459, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 09.09.2019, Publ. 1004711626).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mathys, Christian, von Zürich und Rüschlikon, in Bubikon, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Obrist, Daniel, von Gansingen, in Pfäffikon, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004711626, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LIAG CAPITOL AG, in Zürich, CHE-105.788.459, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 15.07.2019, Publ. 1004675214).
Statutenänderung:
12.07.2019.
Sitz neu:
Winterthur.
Domizil neu:
Neumarkt 13, 8400 Winterthur.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb von Freizeitanlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sigg, Dr. Hanspeter M., von Dörflingen und Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Sigg-Farner, Dr. Maria Claudia, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.