Reports for LF Sport Management Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LF Sport Management Sàrl
- LF Sport Management Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Sport services». The legal headquarters are in Nyon.
- LF Sport Management Sàrl was founded on 05.06.2002.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.09.2019.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company LF Sport Management Sàrl is the following: CHE-109.603.174.
- ALTO Swiss Sàrl, AOM Consulting SA, AROL Delta Luxury Intercigar SA are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.06.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.029.964-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.603.174
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a le but suivant: services de placement privé de sportifs; gestion du droit d'image et gestion de carrière de sportifs; organisation d'événements sportifs; formation dans le domaine du sport, notamment le marketing et la communication en faveur de sportifs; acquisition, détention, gestion et vente de participations dans des entreprises actives dans le domaine sportif (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- M.I.L. Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LF Sport Management Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004715030, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
M.I.L. Sàrl, à Gland, CHE-109.603.174 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 12 août 2019 et 5 septembre 2019.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
LF Sport Management Sàrl. Siège transféré à Nyon.
Nouvelle adresse:
Impasse Champ-Colin 6, 1260 Nyon.
Nouveau but:
la société a le but suivant: services de placement privé de sportifs;
gestion du droit d'image et gestion de carrière de sportifs;
organisation d'événements sportifs;
formation dans le domaine du sport, notamment le marketing et la communication en faveur de sportifs;
acquisition, détention, gestion et vente de participations dans des entreprises actives dans le domaine sportif (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Nouvelles communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel.
Publication number: 5109284, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
M.I.L. Sàrl, à Gland, CH-550-1029964-9, commerce de produits alimentaires et de boissons (FOSC du 17.12.2002, p. 19/777018). Statuts modifiés le 18 juin 2009.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts. Selon déclaration du gérant du 18 juin 2009, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Communications aux associés:
par n'importe quel moyen de transmission écrit ou imprimable (p. ex. courrier écrit, télécopie ou courrier électronique). Le capital social de CHF 20'000 est divisé en 200 parts de CHF 100, dont Falbo Laurent, maintenant de Gland, est titulaire (précédemment 1 part de CHF 20'000).
Publication number: 777018, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
M.I.L. Sàrl, à Gland, commerce de produits alimentaires et de boissons alcoolisées ou non (FOSC du 11.06.2002, p. 16). Statuts modifiés le 2 décembre 2002. Nicolas-Arques Michel, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, a cédé sa part de CHF 10'000 à l'associé-gérant Falbo Laurent, dont la part est portée de CHF 10'000 à CHF 20'000, lequel signe désormais individuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.