Reports for Lavaux Vinorama SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lavaux Vinorama SA
- Lavaux Vinorama SA has its legal headquarters in Puidoux and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of restaurants».
- The management of the company Lavaux Vinorama SA consists of 7 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 01.03.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.926.743.
Management (7)
newest board members
Philippe Herminjard,
Pierre Monachon,
Blaise Duboux,
Jean-Christophe Butty,
Vincent Chappuis
newest authorized signatories
Philippe Herminjard,
Pierre Monachon,
Blaise Duboux,
Jean-Christophe Butty,
Vincent Chappuis
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.06.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Puidoux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.058.396-7
UID/VAT
CHE-114.926.743
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la promotion du vignoble en terrases de Lavaux, notamment l'exploitation d'un lieu de découverte de la vigne et du vin, la vente de vins et autres produits ainsi que la fourniture de tous services en relation avec la viticulture (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lavaux Vinorama SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005975512, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Lavaux Vinorama SA, à Puidoux, CHE-114.926.743 (FOSC du 06.02.2018, p. 0/4038291). Keller Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Herminjard Philippe, de Corsier-sur-Vevey, à Vevey, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux, avec le président ou le vice-président.
Publication number: 4038291, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Lavaux Vinorama SA, à Puidoux, CHE-114.926.743 (FOSC du 01.03.2017, p. 0/3377899). Statuts modifiés le 29 novembre 2017. Le capital-actions de CHF 100'000 a été libéré ultérieurement par compensation d'une créance de CHF 50'000.
Publication number: 3377899, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Lavaux Vinorama SA, à Puidoux, CHE-114.926.743, promotion du vignoble en terrases de Lavaux (FOSC du 26.06.2009, p. 32/5094298). Vogel Charles, Baumann Paul, Emery Daniel, Friedli Silvia, Pache Isabelle ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Nouveaux administrateurs Monachon Pierre, de Montanaire, à Rivaz, président, avec signature collective à deux, toutefois pas avec Chappuis Vincent, Butty Jean-Christophe, de Rueyres-les-Prés, à Puidoux, Duboux Blaise, de et à Bourg-en-Lavaux, tous deux avec signature collective à deux, avec le président ou le vice-président.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.