Reports for Lasttrans AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lasttrans AG
- Lasttrans AG with its legal headquarters in Attiswil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road». Lasttrans AG is active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 24.03.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-110.041.030.
- Max Kurth Transport AG, s. grüninger have the same address as Lasttrans AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.03.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Attiswil
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.016.179-1
UID/VAT
CHE-110.041.030
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Transporten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an Unternehmen mit gleicher oder ähnlicher Zwecksetzung beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und belasten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lasttrans AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005131913, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lasttrans AG, in Attiswil, CHE-110.041.030, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2017, Publ. 3301345).
Statutenänderung:
17.03.2021.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Ausführung von Transporten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an Unternehmen mit gleicher oder ähnlicher Zwecksetzung beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und belasten.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme bei der Gründung ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung vom Sacheinleger, Roland Kurth, in Attiswil, eine Forderung gegen die "Max Kurth Transport AG", in Attiswil, gemäss Sacheinlage-/Sachübernahmevertrag vom 28.02.2003 zum Preis von CHF 106'000.--, wofür 100 voll liberierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und dem Sacheinleger CHF 6'000.-- als Forderung in den Büchern der Gesellschaft gutgeschrieben werden.]. [Die Bestimmung über die beabsichtigte Sachübernahme bei der Gründung ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Beabsichtigte Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft beabsichtigt, nach der Gründung gemäss einem noch zu erstellenden Kaufvertrag, von der "Max Kurth Transport AG", in Attiswil, drei Lastwagen der Marke Scania (Typen: R113 ML 6x2 380;
R124 LB 6x2 NA;
R124 LB 4x2 NA) sowie einen Anhänger (Andres UA-12/79) zum Preis von höchstens CHF 106'000.-- zu übernehmen.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich oder per Mail. Gemäss Erklärung vom 17.03.2021 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kurth, Roland, von Attiswil, in Attiswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
BDO AG (CHE-327.753.565), in Grenchen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kurth, Michael, von Attiswil, in Attiswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Tièche, Nadine, von Attiswil, in Attiswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3301345, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lasttrans AG, in Attiswil, CHE-110.041.030, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 11.09.2014, Publ. 1709539).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kurth, Roland, von Attiswil, in Attiswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kurth, Michael, von Attiswil, in Attiswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1709539, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Lasttrans AG, in Attiswil, CHE-110.041.030, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 56 vom 22.03.2010, S. 5, Publ. 5551060).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-327.753.565), in Grenchen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BDO AG (CH-254.9.000.021-9)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.