Reports for LARE Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LARE Immobilien AG
- LARE Immobilien AG from Zürich operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The management of the company LARE Immobilien AG, which was founded on the 27.10.2005, consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 25.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company LARE Immobilien AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.608.054.
Management (4)
newest board members
Moses Jakob Rosengarten,
Benjamin Rosengarten,
Michael Spitzer,
Raphael Aaron Rechnitzer
newest authorized signatories
Moses Jakob Rosengarten,
Benjamin Rosengarten,
Michael Spitzer,
Raphael Aaron Rechnitzer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.10.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.013.639-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.608.054
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, die Verwaltung und den Verkauf von Immobilien sowie die Beratung und die Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen auf dem Immobiliensektor. Sie kann sich an in- und ausländischen Gesellschaften mit ähnlichem oder gleichem Zweck beteiligen. Sie kann ferner sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, die mit diesem Zweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängen und geeignet sind, diesen zu fördern. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRETOR AG | Liestal | 02.11.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- LARE Immobilien SA
- LARE Immobilien Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LARE Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006065831, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
LARE Immobilien AG, bisher in Aesch (BL), CHE-112.608.054, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2023, Publ. 1005902665).
Statutenänderung:
06.06.2024.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Weststrasse 116, 8003 Zürich.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Kauf, die Verwaltung und den Verkauf von Immobilien sowie die Beratung und die Erbringung sämtlicher Dienstleistungen auf dem Immobiliensektor. Sie kann sich an in- und ausländischen Gesellschaften mit ähnlichem oder gleichem Zweck beteiligen. Sie kann ferner sämtliche Geschäfte tätigen, die mit diesem Zweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängen und geeignet sind, diesen zu fördern. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jeger, Aurel Manuel, von Meltingen, in Biel-Benken, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Strecker, Kurt, von Liestal, in Dornach, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rosengarten, Moses Jakob, von Egg, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1006066439, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
LARE Immobilien AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-112.608.054, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2023, Publ. 1005902665). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Zürich im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Basel-Landschaft von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005902665, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
LARE Immobilien AG, in Aesch (BL), CHE-112.608.054, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2023, Publ. 1005825869).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Strecker, Kurt, von Liestal, in Dornach, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.