Address
c/o Christof Düring
Unterhueb 912
9304 Bernhardzell
Reports for Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell
- Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell has its legal headquarters in Bernhardzell and is active. It is a Cooperative and active in the industry «Trading in agricultural products and livestock».
- The management of the organization Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell, which was founded on the 25.01.1949, consists of 6 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 22.08.2023.
- Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell is registered in the Canton of SG under the UID CHE-107.139.467.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Christof Düring,
Elmar Schöb,
Benno Luder,
Alfred Zahner,
Cornel Heim
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.01.1949
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Waldkirch
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.5.006.340-5
UID/VAT
CHE-107.139.467
Sector
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung und Sicherung der wirtschaftlichen Interessen ihrer Mitglieder, namentlich durch preisgünstige, fristgerechte und kontinuierliche Vermittlung eines bedarfsgerechten Sortiments qualitativ hochwertiger Artikel des land- und hauswirtschaftlichen Bedarfs sowie zielgerichtete Beschaffung und Vermarktung landwirtschaftlicher Erzeugnisse; fördert die genossenschaftliche Zusammenarbeit und das genossenschaftliche Denken sowie die beruflichen Kenntnisse ihrer Mitglieder durch Kurse und Vorträge.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft Bernhardzell
- Landw. Genossenschaft Bernhardzell
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005821164, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell, in Waldkirch, CHE-107.139.467, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2017, S.0, Publ. 3662049).
Domizil neu:
c/o Christof Düring, Unterhueb 912, 9304 Bernhardzell.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Signer, Albert, von Appenzell, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Düring, Christof, von Niederbüren, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Schöb, Elmar, von Gams, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bürke, Arthur, von Wittenbach, in Wittenbach, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch)].
Publication number: 3662049, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell, in Waldkirch, CHE-107.139.467, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 10.12.2009, S. 17, Publ. 5385202).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eicher, Josef, von Ernetschwil, in Engelburg (Gaiserwald), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wanner, Alfred genannt Fredy, von Etzelkofen, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Luder, Benno, von Höchstetten, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Zahner, Alfred, genannt Fredi, von Kaltbrunn, in Waldkirch, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Zahner, Fredy, Mitglied der Verwaltung ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Düring, Christof, von Niederbüren, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bürke, Arthur, von Wittenbach, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 5385202, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Landi, Landwirtschaftliche Genossenschaft, Bernhardzell, in Waldkirch, CH-320.5.006.340-5, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 30.05.2008, S. 13, Publ. 4499924).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tanner, Kurt, von Herisau, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wanner, Alfred genannt Fredy, von Etzelkofen, in Bernhardzell (Waldkirch), Vizepräsident der Verwaltung und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuar mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zahner, Fredy, von Kaltbrunn, in Waldkirch, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.