Address
Quartier de l'innovation, Daniel Borel Innovation Center
1015 Lausanne
Reports for Labtec Europe SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Labtec Europe SA
- Labtec Europe SA with its legal headquarters in Lausanne is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of computer equipment». Labtec Europe SA is active.
- Labtec Europe SA has one person entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 16.09.2022.
- Labtec Europe SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-100.228.041.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.02.1998
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ecublens (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.174.040-2
UID/VAT
CHE-100.228.041
Sector
Manufacturing of computer equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commercialisation, promotion, développement et distribution, en Suisse et en Europe principalement, d'articles, services et droits afférents, notamment - mais non exclusivement - au domaine informatique, équipement d'ordinateurs et instruments optiques, et en particulier commercialisation, promotion, développement et distribution d'articles, services et droits relatifs à la marque Labtec.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | <2004 | 06.04.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Natural Computing SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Labtec Europe SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005563512, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Labtec Europe SA, à Ecublens (VD), CHE-100.228.041 (FOSC du 28.02.2019, p. 0/1004577434). Hostens (nom d'usage Gerelli) Carine n'est plus administratrice;
sa signature est radiée. Stettler François n'est plus président.
Publication number: HR02-1004577434, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Labtec Europe SA, à Ecublens (VD), CHE-100.228.041 (FOSC du 08.02.2017, p. 0/3335475). Schuler Cyrill n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Stettler François, administrateur président, signe désormais individuellement.
Nouvelle administratrice avec signature collective à deux avec le président:
Hostens (nom d'usage Gerelli) Carine, de France, à Thoiry (France).
Publication number: 3335475, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Labtec Europe SA, à Ecublens (VD), CHE-100.228.041 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Verbruggen Paul n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature collective à deux:
Schuler Cyrill, de Schwyz, à Commugny.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.