Reports for Labeltech AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Labeltech AG
- Labeltech AG from Münsingen operates in the sector «Trading with machines» and is active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 17.11.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Labeltech AG is the following: CHE-110.239.454.
- On the same address as Labeltech AG there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: Bruno Rapp AG, IL-Tec AG, Intresa Verpackungen GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.09.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Münsingen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.032.355-0
UID/VAT
CHE-110.239.454
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel mit technischen Geräten und Ersatzteilen, insbesondere solcher zur Verarbeitung von Etiketten aller Art, sowie den Handel und die Verarbeitung von Druckerzeugnissen und Druck- und Gestaltungs-Software. Des weiteren kann sie solche und ähnliche Produkte warten und Service- oder andere Dienstleistungen erbringen. Zur Erzielung der vorgenannten Zwecke kann sie auch Vertretungen von Herstellern aus dem In- und Ausland übernehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Liegenschaften erwerben, Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Unternehmungen erwerben oder gründen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treucontrol AG | Egg | 08.04.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Weber Gähwiler Revisions AG | Zürich | 08.06.2010 | 07.04.2020 | |
Revdata Revisions- & Beratungs-AG | Zürich | <2004 | 07.06.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Labeltech AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005024212, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Labeltech AG, in Münsingen, CHE-110.239.454, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 13.05.2020, Publ. 1004888361).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischer, Kurt, von Triengen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004888361, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Labeltech AG, in Münsingen, CHE-110.239.454, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 08.04.2020, Publ. 1004868188).
Domizil neu:
Südstrasse 4a, 3110 Münsingen.
Publication number: HR02-1004868188, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Labeltech AG, in Münsingen, CHE-110.239.454, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 19.06.2012, S.0, Publ. 6725158).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber Gähwiler Revisions AG (CH-020.3.928.452-7), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischer, Christine, von Morschach und Triengen, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Wagner, Andreas, von Biglen, in Münsingen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Fischer, Kurt, von Triengen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Treucontrol AG (CHE-102.086.823), in Egg b. Zürich (Egg), Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.