Reports for La Posada SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout La Posada SA
- La Posada SA is active in the industry «Services for banks and credit institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Zofingen.
- The company was founded on 28.09.2004 and has 5 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 24.07.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-112.019.739.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Aguadulce AG, Forchtal Communication AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Eduardo Valenzuela,
Javier Aldekoa Beitia,
Johannes Peter Schlaepfer,
Santiago Valenzuela,
Servet Nevzat Alci
newest authorized signatories
Eduardo Valenzuela,
Javier Aldekoa Beitia,
Johannes Peter Schlaepfer,
Santiago Valenzuela,
Servet Nevzat Alci
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.09.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zofingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.027.644-0
UID/VAT
CHE-112.019.739
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratungen, Planungen und Betreuung in finanziellen Angelegenheiten, insbesondere im Immobilienbereich aber auch anderen Investitionen; kann Warenhandel betreiben, Importe und Exporte mit Waren und Gütern im Non-Food Bereich betreiben, für sich selbst oder Dritte, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften eröffnen, sich an Unternehmen gleicher und verwandter Branchen beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum und Immobilien erwerben, halten, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
w & s consulting gmbh in Liquidation | Rapperswil-Jona | 01.07.2005 | 24.03.2009 | |
Eurams AG in Liquidation | Zürich | 04.10.2004 | 30.06.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Paghera Investment AG
- Liptus AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: La Posada SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006092912, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
La Posada SA, in Zofingen, CHE-112.019.739, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 25.05.2021, Publ. 1005190928).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schläpfer, Johannes Peter, von Herisau, unbekannten Aufenthaltes, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Baden].
Publication number: HR02-1005190928, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
La Posada SA, in Zofingen, CHE-112.019.739, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 03.05.2018, Publ. 4210181).
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 1. Mai 2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Die Statuten der Gesellschaft sind noch nicht an die Umwandlung angepasst worden;
die Anpassung muss anlässlich der nächsten Statutenänderung erfolgen.
Publication number: 4210181, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
La Posada SA, in Zofingen, CHE-112.019.739, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 02.10.2017, Publ. 3783725).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Valenzuela, Eduardo, argentinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Chascomus (AR), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Valenzuela, Santiago, argentinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Chascomus (AR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Aldekoa Beitia, Javier, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Onati (ES), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schläpfer, Johannes Peter, von Herisau, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.