Address
Route du Grand-St-Bernard 28
1921 Martigny-Croix
Reports for La Fromathèque SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout La Fromathèque SA
- La Fromathèque SA has its legal headquarters in Martigny-Croix and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production of comestibles».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 29.08.2024.
- La Fromathèque SA is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-479.867.030.
Management (4)
newest board members
Yann Olivier Sütterlin,
Bertrand Gabioud,
Benoît Gilbert Bender,
Blaise Moret
newest authorized signatories
Yann Olivier Sütterlin,
Bertrand Gabioud,
Benoît Gilbert Bender,
Blaise Moret
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.07.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Martigny-Combe
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.008.601-4
UID/VAT
CHE-479.867.030
Sector
Production of comestibles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une fromathèque (fabrication, affinage et commercialisation de fromages et de produits laitiers ainsi que de tout produit du terroir); la société peut effectuer toute opération financière ou commerciale en rapport avec son but ou apte à le favoriser; elle peut en outre créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, prendre des participations, fonder ou financer des entreprises ayant un rapport direct ou indirect avec son but.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Saint-Bernard Audit Sàrl | Orsières | 22.01.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire du St-Bernard SA | Orsières | 02.09.2016 | 21.01.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: La Fromathèque SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006117610, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
La Fromathèque SA, à Martigny-Combe, CHE-479.867.030, société anonyme (No. FOSC 14 du 22.01.2018, Publ. 4004653).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Sütterlin, Yann Olivier, de Genève, à Orsières, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux avec le président [précédemment: administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux];
Bender, Benoît Gilbert, de Fully, à Martigny, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président [précédemment: administrateur, sans droit de signature];
Moret, Blaise, de Martigny, à Martigny-Combe, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec le président [précédemment: administrateur, sans droit de signature].
Publication number: 4004653, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
La Fromathèque SA, à Martigny-Combe, CHE-479.867.030, société anonyme (No. FOSC 170 du 02.09.2016, Publ. 3035521).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Fiduciaire du St-Bernard Sàrl, à Orsières, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Saint-Bernard Audit Sàrl (CHE-375.481.872), à Orsières, organe de révision.
Publication number: 3035521, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
La Fromathèque SA, à Martigny-Combe, CHE-479.867.030, société anonyme (No. FOSC 133 du 12.07.2013, Publ. 974853). [biffé: Selon déclaration du 22.06.2013, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fiduciaire du St-Bernard Sàrl (CHE-114.713.093), à Orsières, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.