Reports for LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl
- LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl is active in the industry «General structural engineering» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Saxon.
- LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl has one person entered in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 29.01.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-115.626.864.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.04.2010
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Saxon
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.008.015-2
UID/VAT
CHE-115.626.864
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Construction, rénovation, entretien des biens immobiliers et toute activité s'y rapprochant directement ou indirectement; la société peut consentir des prêts à ses associés (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Un Peu de Nous Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005946840, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl, à Saxon, CHE-115.626.864, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 37 du 22.02.2019, Publ. 1004573284).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue de la Toule 9, 1907 Saxon.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Asani, Liridon, citoyen macédonien du Nord, à Evionnaz, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: Asanoski, Liridon, citoyen macédonien, à Saxon].
Publication number: HR02-1004573284, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Un Peu de Nous Sàrl, à Monthey, CHE-115.626.864, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 83 du 30.04.2010, p.18, Publ. 5611538).
Modification des statuts:
30.01.2019.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
LA CONSTRUCTION GROUP Sàrl.
Nouveau siège:
Saxon.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Rhône 6, 1907 Saxon.
Nouveau but:
construction, rénovation, entretien des biens immobiliers et toute activité s'y rapprochant directement ou indirectement;
la société peut consentir des prêts à ses associés (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Heijerman, Anita, de Worb, à Monthey, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Asanoski, Liridon, citoyen macédonien, à Saxon, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 5611538, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Un Peu de Nous Sàrl, à Monthey, CH-621.4.008.015-2, Rue du Closillon 25, 1870 Monthey, nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Date des statuts:
21.04.2010.
But:
vente de meubles et décoration en tous genres (cf statuts).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.--.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou courriel. Selon déclaration du 21.04.2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Personne inscrite:
Heijerman, Anita, de Worb, à Monthey, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.--.