Reports for Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH
- Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Cham. Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH belongs to the industry «Services for insurance and pensions» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 05.09.2014.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 17.06.2019, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH is registered in the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-433.111.298.
- Companies with an identical address: ADORO GROUP GmbH, Agro Swiss Trading SA, Arbom AG.
Management (3)
newest authorized signatories
Pedro Steinmann,
Adalbert Max Bruno Pfister,
Brigitte Klara Pfister-Rösen
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.09.2014
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.038.713-5
UID/VAT
CHE-433.111.298
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Aktive, an den Kundenbedürfnissen angepasste, unabhängige Versicherungsvermittlung, Versicherungschecks, Versicherungsberatung, sowie Versicherungstreuhand, vorwiegend in den Bereichen Krankenversicherung, Unfallversicherung und Taggeldversicherung für Privatpersonen und Geschäftskunden, Erbringung von Beratungen und Dienstleistungen vorwiegend im Finanz- und Versicherungssektor sowie Handel (Import/Export) mit Waren aller Art. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen oder Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und verwalten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004652416, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH, in Cham, CHE-433.111.298, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 30.06.2017, Publ. 3614017).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfister, Pascal Sven, von Männedorf, in Berikon, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steinmann, Pedro, von Wohlenschwil, in Killwangen, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3614639, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH, in Bremgarten (AG), CHE-433.111.298, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 10.09.2014, Publ. 1707603). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Cham im Handelsregister des Kantons Aargau von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 3614017, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Krankenkasseninfo.ch GmbH, bisher in Bremgarten (AG), CHE-433.111.298, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 10.09.2014, Publ. 1707603).
Statutenänderung:
30.05.2017.
Sitz neu:
Cham.
Domizil neu:
Klostermatt 4, 6330 Cham.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfister, Brigitte Klara, von Männedorf, in Schopfheim (DE), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Bremgarten (AG)];
Pfister, Adalbert Max Bruno, von Männedorf, in Schopfheim (DE), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 10 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Bremgarten (AG)];
Pfister, Pascal Sven, von Männedorf, in Berikon, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.