Reports for Kramer Brennstoffe AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kramer Brennstoffe AG
- Kramer Brennstoffe AG with its legal headquarters in Dielsdorf is active. Kramer Brennstoffe AG operates in the sector «Transportation of passenger and freight by road».
- The company was founded on 14.06.1984 and has 2 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 12.10.2017. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Kramer Brennstoffe AG is the following: CHE-105.750.698.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.06.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dielsdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.915.244-8
UID/VAT
CHE-105.750.698
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Handel mit festen und flüssigen Brenn- und Treibstoffen aller Art. Sie kann sich bei anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, einschliesslich Erwerb und Verkauf sowie Verwaltung von Liegenschaften.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eugster Treuhand AG | Dübendorf | <2004 | 15.07.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Walter Kramer, Brennstoffe AG
- Walter Kramer Brennstoffe AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kramer Brennstoffe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3805429, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kramer Brennstoffe AG, in Dielsdorf, CHE-105.750.698, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2017, Publ. 3610413).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kramer, Claudia, von Basel, in Niederglatt, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: 3610413, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kramer Brennstoffe AG, in Dielsdorf, CHE-105.750.698, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 11.09.2015, Publ. 2368337).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kramer, Walter, von Sumiswald, in Niederhasli, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2368337, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kramer Brennstoffe AG, in Dielsdorf, CHE-105.750.698, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 15.04.2011, Publ. 6124558).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kramer, Thomas, von Sumiswald, in Niederglatt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.